CAMBRIDGE & COLERIDGE ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity number: 1169959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steve Green Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Chris Hurcomb Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
KEITH CLARKE Chair 31 October 2016 None on record
Marie Whittle Trustee 30 November 2016 None on record
Richard Lyle Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Neil Costello Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Gill Bridger Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Edward Graham Hall Trustee 04 March 2019 None on record
Vashti MacDonald-Clink Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Mo Park Trustee 30 November 2016 None on record
Stu Dunlop Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Richard Park Trustee 28 November 2017 None on record