Accounts and annual returns DISABILITY SPORTS HUMBER

Charity number: 1169629
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 October 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 October 2021 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 August 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 24 August 2018 25 days late Download Open in new window