ST MARK'S PARISH CHURCH REPAIR FUND

Charity number: 508870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £306 £371 £327 £389 £401
Total expenditure £306 £371 £327 £389 £401
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A