WORTH VALLEY YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 508871
Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £20.50k £10.99k £27.76k £16.87k £8.65k
Total expenditure £16.92k £15.87k £22.43k £15.75k £10.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A