ZAZAI ASSOCIATION IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1174132
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 March 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 March 2019 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required