Financial history NASFAT THAMESMEAD-WOOLWICH, UK

Charity number: 1170690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £39.36k £33.53k £34.25k £45.86k £54.10k
Total expenditure £42.59k £19.70k £34.83k £36.92k £54.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A