Dogfen lywodraethu ST PAUL'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2013 as amended on 06 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR EDUCATION, SUPPORT, TRAINING, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS RESIDENT IN BALSALL HEATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND WHERE APPROPRIATE THE REMAINDER OF THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROJECTS, HEALTH SERVICES, FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, COMMUNITY EVENTS, COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, CAPACITY BUILDING AND THE PROVISION OF MANAGEMENT AND ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT TO OTHER VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY GROUPS, BEING FACILITIES - (A) OF WHICH SUCH PERSONS HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY; AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING..
Maes buddion
BALSALL HEATH AND SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.