BROADLANDS GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1170398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD BENTON Trustee 04 August 2021
THE WEST GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Sarah Vey Trustee 08 September 2021 None on record
SUZANNE MARGARET STRATFORD Trustee 29 October 1998 None on record
Anthony John Williams Trustee 04 August 2021 None on record
Neil Frank Stratford Trustee 24 March 2020 None on record
Sara Phyliss Louise Mason Trustee 29 October 1998
Martyr Worthy Village Hall Received: On time
IAN KIRKWOOD GIBSON Trustee 28 November 2017 None on record
Anne MARIE Tomlinson Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
NIGEL JOHN HOPPITT Chair 03 November 2005 None on record
Sharon Rafter Trustee 21 October 2021 None on record