THE SUTTON HOO SHIP'S COMPANY

Charity number: 1175475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Anthony Startin Trustee 27 January 2019 None on record
ANDREW FITZGERALD Trustee 15 September 2016 None on record
Simon Jonothon Steel Trustee 27 January 2019 None on record
Professor MARTIN CARVER Chair 15 September 2016 None on record
Jacqueline Barnard Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Philip Leech Trustee 30 June 2017 None on record
Richard Julian Whitewright Trustee 02 September 2019 None on record
David John Pryor Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
PETER HENRY CLAY Trustee 15 September 2016 None on record