COTTON TEXTILES RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 509075
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 September 2016 On time Download