Trustees EAST BUDLEIGH WITH BICTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1171367

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Eveline Allan | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Charlotte Gay MSc | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louis James Walter Allan | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hamilton Armour | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Duncan Houston | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Andrew Stanford James | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lee Pulley | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
BONNIE ANNE BLACKWELL | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.