Financial history EAST BUDLEIGH WITH BICTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1171367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.81k £12.77k £17.26k £20.15k £19.92k
Total expenditure £21.31k £12.10k £24.94k £27.14k £21.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £6.05k £3.53k N/A