Financial history SAINT BARBARA'S GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (SOUTHEND ON SEA DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1172177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £60.85k £42.74k £42.10k £36.11k £36.02k
Total expenditure £46.12k £38.71k £37.24k £34.06k £33.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.97k N/A