Accounts and annual returns ART MONTHLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 March 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window