Accounts and annual returns NEW HORIZONS CHILDREN'S ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1171499
Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 26 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 26 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 392 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 392 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 January 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 January 2019 | 23 June 2021 | 590 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 January 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window