TYNE AND WEAR CENTRE AGAINST UNEMPLOYMENT

Charity number: 1171669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download