Accounts and annual returns NEWPORT FAMILY CENTRE
Charity number: 1175306
Charity reporting is overdue by 391 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 25 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 25 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 391 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 391 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 582 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 582 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 01 November 2022 | 945 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 01 November 2022 | 945 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window