Financial history FRIENDS OF WEST GATE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509175
Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £7.81k £9.99k £3.60k £5.17k £3.12k
Total expenditure £1.93k £26.80k £793 £4.03k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A