Financial history The Arts Society Totnes

Charity number: 1171682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £13.73k £20.32k £19.39k £3.28k £9.75k
Total expenditure £12.37k £16.99k £17.96k £5.49k £8.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A