BATH WELCOMES REFUGEES

Charity number: 1171442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 June 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 June 2019 42 days late Download