MAIDSTONE CYCLE CAMPAIGN FORUM

Charity number: 1172691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time Download