Trustees ACCESS ALL AREAS
Charity number: 1172706
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ann Marie Pickthall | Chair | 19 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Himanshu Acharya | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Salter | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Jane Bennett | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Gange Butter Keon MBE | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Bates | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK WILLIAM PATRICK WAY | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christian | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLUDAYO KOLEOSHO | Trustee | 16 August 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.