BLACKHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 February 2020 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 February 2020 95 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 January 2020 446 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1054 days