Trustees SOUTH WEST INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT NETWORK
Charity number: 1173320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES HILL | Chair | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Donald Mavunduse | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Urry | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Whitelaw-Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Davis | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIGIST DESTA GRIEVE | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HAYNES | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Galvin | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.