Financial history ST JOHN'S, PERRY BARR, 236TH BIRMINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.26k £9.18k £7.67k £7.35k £3.45k
Total expenditure £7.99k £6.73k £8.72k £6.15k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A