Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST TIMOTHY'S CROOKES
Charity number: 1172252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Kay Chapman | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Peter Renshaw | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aidan James Melville | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wigglesworth | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Roshan William Townsend | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACK BAYNE HISCOCK MA | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Amy Rogers-Kay | Trustee | 07 March 2002 |
|
|||||
ROGER MAKIN | Trustee | 28 March 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.