Financial history CHAPEL & YORK UK FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1172653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.18k £39.83k £327.91k £401.44k £1.08m
Total expenditure £17 £14.35k £345.25k £212.23k £1.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.08m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £10
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0