Accounts and annual returns KNOWLE WEST BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1173158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 February 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 February 2020 117 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 January 2019 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2019 331 days late Download Open in new window