Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, BLACKMOOR & WHITEHILL
Charity number: 1171865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Alan Aldous | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Mitchell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Sadler | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ronald Jolliffe | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Buckland | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JILLY ROSEMARY PRIDEAUX | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Anne Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev WENDY NORRIS MALLAS | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Jean Boddington | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin George Arthur Helliwell | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN COOPER | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TORBEN HOULBERG | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVINA SYLVIA HUDSON | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.