Governing document The BRANCH
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/11/1979 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/1987 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) SHALL BE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF RESILIENCE, CHARACTER AND WELL-BEING. THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY ORGANISING AND PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN WHICH FOSTER THEIR COGNITIVE, SOCIAL, AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT IN A SUPPORTIVE AND INCLUSIVE SETTING. AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OR PURPOSES THAT FURTHER THE PRIMARY CHARITABLE OBJECTS MENTIONED ABOVE AND ARE IN LINE WITH THE LEGAL FRAMEWORK FOR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
WEST BROMWICH AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.