Financial history FRIENDS OF ST KENELM'S CHURCH UPTON SNODSBURY

Charity number: 1172859
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £3.43k £1 £23 £35 £12
Total expenditure £2.74k £0 £0 £0 £25
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A