Accounts and annual returns ART INSTITUTIONS OF THE 21ST CENTURY

Charity number: 1173044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window