Accounts and annual returns LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1177665
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window