Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL BENEFICE OF THE ASCENSION, CAMBRIDGE (ST. GILES WITH ST. PETER, ST. LUKE AND ST. AUGUSTINE)
Charity number: 1172822

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR JANET CONSTANCE BUNKER | Chair | 30 June 2007 |
|
|||||
Doreen Hilda Ullinger | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antony William Rix | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Mead | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Crowe | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Catchpole | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK RALPH WILLS BSC, PHD | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET COOPER | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Ambrose | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Revd Dr Thomas Ambrose | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Derrick GIBBS | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR. RICHARD FOOTITT | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr PATRICIA KAY MCGUIRE | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.