THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH

Charity number: 1172266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Alexander Sital-Singh Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Rev TIMOTHY RICHARD JAMES GODDEN Chair 25 January 2017
ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH CHARITY Received: On time
ISABEL MARGARET COLES Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
DIANNE ELIZABETH WEBSTER Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
William David Wood MBE Trustee 02 May 2021 None on record
Samantha Jane Parsons Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
CLAIRE ANNE ROWE Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
JENNIFER MARY NEALE Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
Carol Ann Sital-Singh Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
STEPHEN JAMES THOMAS Trustee 04 October 2020
ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH CHARITY Received: On time
BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Katherine Rachel Biden Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Martin Charles Webster Trustee 25 January 2017
ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH CHARITY Received: On time
Victoria Anne Rees Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
DEREK ANDREW COLLETT Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
Caspian James Risden Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
LESLEY MARIAN HOOPER Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
Dinah Josephine Mary Eaves Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record