Trustees ALNWICK AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 509923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs Y Douglas Chair 08 February 1984
None on record
Lisa Harris Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Chelsea Townsley Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Jennifer Davison Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Mrs S Keenan Trustee 02 March 2007
None on record
Christopher David Purdom Trustee 15 March 2002
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Franchiosey Trustee 21 March 2000
None on record
MRS D HOGG Trustee 16 March 1995
None on record