WHITMORE REANS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509930
Charity reporting is overdue by 234 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required