WHITMORE REANS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509930
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.10k £11.28k £19.88k £21.22k £25.42k
Total expenditure £17.97k £10.81k £15.64k £3.85k £20.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A