Trustees UNIVERSITY OF YORK STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1173404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pierrick Roger | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Young | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Kate Bartholomew | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samira Tasneem | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Njoroge | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Doherty | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanisha Jain | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Nimmo | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Crean | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karishma Asher | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Songtao Hu | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.