Accounts and annual returns THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1172830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 June 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 June 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window