THE LAURENCE MODIANO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1172973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 April 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 April 2020 84 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 07 February 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 07 February 2019 2 days late Download