THE ANGLESEY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 510048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Morgan Roberts Trustee 05 February 2020 None on record
MEURIG WYN EVANS Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
Peter Wyn Williams Chair 06 February 2019 None on record
John Aled Hughes Roberts Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
John Maldwyn Humphreys Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
EMYR WYN HUGHES Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
HUW REDVERS JONES Trustee None on record
Hugh Emlyn Roberts Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record