Accounts and annual returns THE OLDHAM LIAISON OF EX-SERVICE MEN WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 510115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2023 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2023 731 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 February 2023 1097 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1582 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1582 days