Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST HELEN'S CHURCH

Charity number: 1173391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 06 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 05 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window