WINDSOR HILL WOOD

Charity number: 1174810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN ELIZABETH CRISFIELD Trustee 11 November 2020
YOUTH WITH A FUTURE Received: On time
RENNY Susan GYE MA Trustee 11 March 2017 None on record
Peter Timothy Dennis Chair 14 September 2019 None on record
JANE HULL Trustee 10 September 2017 None on record
Edward Giles Henry Membrey Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Sister Anne Frances Elizabeth Martin Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
Virginia Membrey Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record