BRECON ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 510226
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)