BRECON ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 510226
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.98k £9.73k £9.59k £9.55k £9.69k
Other income £16.63k £12.07k £7.24k £20.59k £4.78k
Total expenditure £26.91k £22.86k £22.49k £21.13k £22.37k