7TH NEWARK SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 510303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.44k £20.10k £22.01k £14.69k £8.11k
Total expenditure £11.90k £18.12k £19.83k £9.20k £6.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £300 N/A N/A