Trustees SOUTH WESTERN REGIONAL LIBRARY SERVICES CIO
Charity number: 1176414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Ann Chelin | Chair | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Frances Jane Tout | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kristina Wellard | Trustee | 30 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Garfield Hosking | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chaloner | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jolanta Peters | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Lynne Gundry | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Merryn Elizabeth Kent | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.