BEDLINGTON TERRIER RESCUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1176408
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download